+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (19)
On May 5, 2014 in the House:
- Approved by the Governor - Chapter 334
On April 2, 2014 in the House:
- Passed Enrolled
- Third Reading Passed (92-41)
- House Concur - Senate Amendments
On April 1, 2014 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed with Amendments (47-0)
On March 31, 2014 in the Senate:
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Favorable with Amendments {887674/1 Report Adopted
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
On March 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
On March 18, 2014 in the Senate:
- First Reading Finance
On March 17, 2014 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (98-36)
On March 15, 2014 in the House:
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Floor Amendment (Delegate Arora) {723729/2 Adopted
On March 14, 2014 in the House:
- Special Order until 3/15 (Delegate Davis) Adopted
- Floor Amendment (Delegate Arora) {723729/2
- Favorable with Amendments {243497/1 Report Adopted
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
On February 7, 2014 in the House:
- Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
On February 6, 2014 in the House:
- First Reading Economic Matters
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Statute Amended
- 3-103 - Article - Labor and Employment
+ − Votes (4)
March 31, 2014: Senate - Committee - Finance
March 26, 2014: House Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 92
- Nays: 41
March 23, 2014: Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 47
March 14, 2014: House - Committee - Economic Matters
+ − Sponsors (27)
Type:
Primary Sponsor