+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (14)
On May 15, 2014 in the House:
- Approved by the Governor - Chapter 632
On April 5, 2014 in the House:
- Returned Passed
On April 5, 2014 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed (47-0)
On April 3, 2014 in the Senate:
- Second Reading Passed
- Favorable Report Adopted
- Favorable Report by Finance
On March 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- Hearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m.
On March 18, 2014 in the Senate:
- First Reading Finance
On March 15, 2014 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (130-0)
On March 14, 2014 in the House:
- Second Reading Passed
- Favorable Report Adopted
- Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
On February 12, 2014 in the House:
- Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
On February 6, 2014 in the House:
- First Reading Health and Government Operations
+ − Votes (4)
April 3, 2014: Senate - Committee - Finance
March 27, 2014: Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 47
March 14, 2014: House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
March 12, 2014: House Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 130
+ − Sponsor
Prince George's County Delegation
Type:
Primary Sponsor