+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (16)
On April 26, 2016 in the House:
- Approved by the Governor - Chapter 290
On April 11, 2016 in the House:
- Returned Passed
On April 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed (44-2)
On April 7, 2016 in the Senate:
- Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
- Favorable Report Adopted
- Second Reading Passed
On March 23, 2016 in the Senate:
- Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
On March 21, 2016 in the Senate:
- First Reading Budget and Taxation
On March 18, 2016 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (139-0)
On March 17, 2016 in the House:
- Favorable with Amendments {535567/1 Report Adopted
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
On March 16, 2016 in the House:
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
On February 12, 2016 in the House:
- Hearing cancelled
- Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
On February 10, 2016 in the House:
- First Reading Ways and Means
- Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
+ − Amendment
535567/01
Adopted
+ − Votes (4)
April 7, 2016: Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
April 3, 2016: Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 44
- Nays: 2
March 16, 2016: House - Committee - Ways and Means
March 16, 2016: House Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 139
+ − Sponsors (55)
Type:
Primary Sponsor