+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (20)
On April 6, 2016 in the House:
- House Concur - Senate Amendments
- Third Reading Passed (92-45)
- Passed Enrolled
On April 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed with Amendments (32-13)
On March 31, 2016 in the Senate:
- Favorable with Amendments {519230/1 Report Adopted
- Floor Amendment (Senator Pinsky) {883126/1 Adopted
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
On March 30, 2016 in the Senate:
- Favorable with Amendments {519230/1
- Laid Over (Senator Brochin) Adopted
On March 29, 2016 in the Senate:
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
On March 23, 2016 in the Senate:
- Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m.
On March 21, 2016 in the Senate:
- First Reading Budget and Taxation
On March 19, 2016 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (89-45)
On March 18, 2016 in the House:
- Floor Amendment (Delegate McConkey) {353620/1 Rejected (48-84)
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
On March 17, 2016 in the House:
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
- Favorable with Amendments {195361/1 Report Adopted
- Special Order until 3/18 (Delegate Kaiser) Adopted
On February 10, 2016 in the House:
- First Reading Ways and Means and Appropriations
- Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means)
+ − Amendments (4)
+ − Statutes Amended (15)
- 18-19A-01 - Article - Education
- 18-19A-02 - Article - Education
- 18-19A-03 - Article - Education
- 18-19A-04 - Article - Education
- 18-19A-05 - Article - Education
- 18-301 - Article - Education
- 18-302 - Article - Education
- 18-303 - Article - Education
- 18-306 - Article - Education
- 10-208 - Article - Tax - General
- 18-1401 - Article - Education
- 18-1402 - Article - Education
- 18-304 - Article - Education
- 3-302 - Article - State Finance and Procurement
- 10-207 - Article - Tax - General
+ − Votes (6)
March 29, 2016: Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
March 28, 2016: Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 32
- Nays: 13
March 17, 2016: House - Committee - Appropriations
March 17, 2016: House - Committee - Ways and Means
March 17, 2016: House Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 89
- Nays: 45
March 16, 2016: House Floor - Floor Amendment (McConkey) {353620/1 Rejected
- Yeas: 48
- Nays: 84
+ − Sponsors (50)
Type:
Primary Sponsor