+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (30)
On April 11, 2016 in the House:
- Passed Enrolled
On April 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
- Favorable with Amendments {487376/1
- Special Order until later today (Senator Eckardt) Adopted
On April 11, 2016 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (87-51)
On April 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- Special Order until later today (Senator Bates) Adopted
- Favorable with Amendments {487376/1
- Special Order until later today (Senator Bates) Adopted
- Favorable with Amendments {487376/1
- Committee Amendment Adopted
- Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Special Order until later today (Senator Jennings) Adopted
- Motion Special Order until later today (Senator Jennings) Rejected (15-29)
- Motion limit debate (Senator Pugh) Adopted (30-15)
- Floor Amendment (Senator Young) {483521/1 Rejected (17-29)
- Third Reading Passed with Amendments (26-19)
On April 11, 2016 in the House:
- House Concur - Senate Amendments
On March 28, 2016 in the Senate:
- Hearing cancelled
- Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
On March 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.
On March 21, 2016 in the Senate:
- First Reading Finance
On March 21, 2016 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (84-51)
On March 19, 2016 in the House:
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
- Favorable with Amendments {460910/1 Report Adopted
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
On February 15, 2016 in the House:
- Hearing cancelled
- Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
On February 10, 2016 in the House:
- First Reading Environment and Transportation
- Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
+ − Votes (7)
April 11, 2016: Senate - Committee - Finance
April 9, 2016: House Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 87
- Nays: 51
April 7, 2016: Senate Floor - Floor Amendment (Young) {483521/1 Rejected
- Yeas: 17
- Nays: 29
April 7, 2016: Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 26
- Nays: 19
April 7, 2016: Senate Floor - Motion limit debate (Pugh) Adopted
- Yeas: 30
- Nays: 15
April 7, 2016: Senate Floor - Motion Special Order until later today (Jennings) Rejected
- Yeas: 15
- Nays: 29
March 19, 2016: House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
+ − Sponsors (29)
Type:
Primary Sponsor