+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (15)
On March 23, 2016 in the Senate:
- Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
On March 21, 2016 in the Senate:
- First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
On March 19, 2016 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (104-31)
On March 18, 2016 in the House:
- Floor Amendment (Delegate Buckel) {193821/1 Adopted
- Floor Amendment (Delegate Szeliga) {123027/1 Rejected (55-80)
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
On March 17, 2016 in the House:
- Favorable with Amendments {685667/1 Report Adopted
- Special Order until next session (Delegate Szeliga) Adopted
On March 16, 2016 in the House:
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
On February 26, 2016 in the House:
- Hearing cancelled
- Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
On February 12, 2016 in the House:
- Hearing cancelled
- Hearing 3/02 at 2:30 p.m.
On February 10, 2016 in the House:
- First Reading Ways and Means
- Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (3)
March 17, 2016: House Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 104
- Nays: 31
March 16, 2016: House - Committee - Ways and Means
March 16, 2016: House Floor - Floor Amendment (Szeliga) {123027/1 Rejected
- Yeas: 55
- Nays: 80
+ − Sponsors (23)
Type:
Primary Sponsor