+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (20)
On April 26, 2016 in the House:
- Approved by the Governor - Chapter 288
On April 8, 2016 in the House:
- House Concur - Senate Amendments
- Third Reading Passed (89-49)
- Passed Enrolled
On April 7, 2016 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed with Amendments (43-0)
On April 6, 2016 in the Senate:
- Favorable with Amendments {874937/1 Report Adopted
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
On April 5, 2016 in the Senate:
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
On March 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
- Hearing cancelled
- Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
On March 21, 2016 in the Senate:
- First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
On March 18, 2016 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (95-45)
On March 17, 2016 in the House:
- Favorable with Amendments {435967/1 Report Adopted
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
On March 16, 2016 in the House:
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
On February 12, 2016 in the House:
- Hearing cancelled
- Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
On February 10, 2016 in the House:
- First Reading Ways and Means
- Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Statute Amended
- 10-301.1 - Article - Election Law
+ − Votes (4)
April 2, 2016: House Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 89
- Nays: 49
April 1, 2016: Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 43
March 16, 2016: House - Committee - Ways and Means
+ − Sponsors (41)
Type:
Primary Sponsor