+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (26)
On April 26, 2016 in the House:
- Approved by the Governor - Chapter 287
On April 11, 2016 in the House:
- House Concur - Senate Amendments
- Special Order until later today (Delegate Krebs) Adopted
- Third Reading Passed (105-36)
- Passed Enrolled
On April 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
- Favorable with Amendments {834231/2 Report Adopted
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Special Order until later today (Senator Waugh) Adopted
- Floor Committee Amendment {944633/1 Adopted
- Special Order until later today (Senator Middleton) Adopted
- Third Reading Passed with Amendments (46-0)
On March 24, 2016 in the Senate:
- Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
On March 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
On March 21, 2016 in the House:
- Special Order until later today (Delegate Kipke) Adopted
- Floor Amendment (Delegate Kipke) {523224/1 Rejected (49-81)
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Third Reading Passed (93-43)
On March 19, 2016 in the House:
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
- Favorable with Amendments {695067/1 Report Adopted
- Floor Committee Amendment {925962/1 Adopted
- Special Order until later today (Delegate Kipke) Adopted
On February 12, 2016 in the House:
- Hearing cancelled
- Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
On February 10, 2016 in the House:
- First Reading Ways and Means
- Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
+ − Amendments (5)
+ − Statutes Amended (7)
+ − Votes (5)
April 8, 2016: House Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 105
- Nays: 36
April 6, 2016: Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed with Amendments
- Yeas: 46
March 19, 2016: House - Committee - Ways and Means
March 18, 2016: House Floor - Floor Amendment (Kipke) {523224/1 Rejected
- Yeas: 49
- Nays: 81
+ − Sponsors (79)
Type:
Primary Sponsor