+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (5)
On March 17, 2016 in the House:
- Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
On March 8, 2016 in the House:
- Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
On March 2, 2016 in the House:
- Hearing cancelled
On February 17, 2016 in the House:
- Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
On February 10, 2016 in the House:
- First Reading Health and Government Operations
+ − Statute Amended
- 15-814 - Article - Insurance
+ − Sponsors (29)
Type:
Primary Sponsor