+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (14)
On May 10, 2016 in the House:
- Approved by the Governor - Chapter 437
On April 7, 2016 in the House:
- Returned Passed
On April 6, 2016 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed (37-8)
On April 5, 2016 in the Senate:
- Favorable Report Adopted
- Second Reading Passed
On April 4, 2016 in the Senate:
- Favorable Report by Finance
On March 19, 2016 in the Senate:
- Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
On March 18, 2016 in the Senate:
- First Reading Finance
On March 17, 2016 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (101-38)
On March 16, 2016 in the House:
- Favorable with Amendments {766880/1 Report Adopted
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
On March 15, 2016 in the House:
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
On February 17, 2016 in the House:
- Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
On February 10, 2016 in the House:
- First Reading Health and Government Operations
+ − Amendment
766880/01
Adopted
+ − Statute Amended
- 15-831 - Article - Insurance
+ − Votes (4)
April 4, 2016: Senate - Committee - Finance
March 31, 2016: Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 37
- Nays: 8
March 15, 2016: House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
March 14, 2016: House Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 101
- Nays: 38
+ − Sponsors (71)
Type:
Primary Sponsor