+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (18)
On May 19, 2016 in the House:
- Approved by the Governor - Chapter 639
On April 7, 2016 in the House:
- Returned Passed
On April 7, 2016 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed (39-7)
On April 6, 2016 in the Senate:
- Favorable Report by Finance
- Favorable Report Adopted
- Second Reading Passed
On March 31, 2016 in the Senate:
- Hearing cancelled
- Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.
On March 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
On March 21, 2016 in the Senate:
- First Reading Finance
On March 18, 2016 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (121-19)
On March 17, 2016 in the House:
- Floor Amendment (Delegate Fisher) {663522/1 Rejected (52-89)
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
On March 16, 2016 in the House:
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
- Favorable with Amendments {733496/1 Report Adopted
- Special Order until next session (Delegate Davis) Adopted
On February 10, 2016 in the House:
- First Reading Economic Matters
- Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (5)
April 6, 2016: Senate - Committee - Finance
April 1, 2016: Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 39
- Nays: 7
March 16, 2016: House - Committee - Economic Matters
March 16, 2016: House Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 121
- Nays: 19
March 14, 2016: House Floor - Floor Amendment (Fisher) {663522/1 Rejected
- Yeas: 52
- Nays: 89
+ − Sponsors (55)
Type:
Primary Sponsor