+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (27)
On May 19, 2016 in the House:
- Approved by the Governor - Chapter 557
On April 9, 2016 in the House:
- House Concur - Senate Amendments
- Third Reading Passed (103-33)
- Passed Enrolled
On April 7, 2016 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed with Amendments (32-13)
On April 6, 2016 in the Senate:
- Favorable with Amendments {407776/1 Report Adopted
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
On April 5, 2016 in the Senate:
- Favorable with Amendments {407776/1
- Special Order until 4/6 (Senator Hershey) Adopted
On April 4, 2016 in the Senate:
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
On March 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
On March 21, 2016 in the Senate:
- First Reading Finance
On March 18, 2016 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (93-47)
On March 17, 2016 in the House:
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
- Favorable with Amendments {453897/1 Report Adopted
- Special Order until next session (Delegate Kipke) Adopted
- Floor Amendment (Delegate Grammer) {583528/1 Rejected (49-87)
- Floor Amendment (Delegate McComas) {303528/1 Rejected (50-87)
- Floor Amendment (Delegate Krebs) {373324/1 Rejected (47-90)
- Floor Amendment (Delegate Kittleman) {833628/1 Rejected (53-86)
- Floor Amendment (Delegate McConkey) {313024/1 Rejected (47-89)
- Floor Amendment (Delegate Buckel) {873621/1 Rejected (45-89)
- Floor Amendment (Delegate Buckel) {973922/1 Rejected (48-87)
- Floor Amendment (Delegate Malone) {203322/1 Rejected (48-88)
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
On February 10, 2016 in the House:
- First Reading Economic Matters
- Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
+ − Amendments (10)
+ − Statutes Amended (5)
+ − Votes (12)
April 4, 2016: Senate - Committee - Finance
April 3, 2016: House Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 103
- Nays: 33
April 1, 2016: Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 32
- Nays: 13
March 17, 2016: House - Committee - Economic Matters
March 15, 2016: House Floor - Floor Amendment (Kittleman) {833628/1 Rejected
- Yeas: 53
- Nays: 86
March 15, 2016: House Floor - Floor Amendment (Krebs) {373324/1 Rejected
- Yeas: 47
- Nays: 90
March 15, 2016: House Floor - Floor Amendment (Malone) {203322/1 Rejected
- Yeas: 48
- Nays: 88
March 15, 2016: House Floor - Floor Amendment (McComas) {303528/1 Rejected
- Yeas: 50
- Nays: 87
March 15, 2016: House Floor - Floor Amendment (McConkey) {313024/1 Rejected
- Yeas: 47
- Nays: 89
March 15, 2016: House Floor - Floor Amendment (Grammer) {583528/1 Rejected
- Yeas: 49
- Nays: 87
March 15, 2016: House Floor - Floor Amendment (Buckel) {973922/1 Rejected
- Yeas: 48
- Nays: 87
March 15, 2016: House Floor - Floor Amendment (Buckel) {873621/1 Rejected
- Yeas: 45
- Nays: 89
+ − Sponsors (90)
Type:
Primary Sponsor