+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (18)
On March 16, 2016 in the Senate:
- First Reading Judicial Proceedings
On March 15, 2016 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (81-54)
On March 11, 2016 in the House:
- Floor Amendment (Delegate B. Barnes) {513224/1 Adopted
- Floor Amendment (Delegate S. Howard) {863923/1 Rejected (59-78)
- Floor Amendment (Delegate C. Wilson) {113921/1 Adopted
- Floor Amendment (Delegate Flanagan) {693527/1 Rejected (55-82)
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
On March 9, 2016 in the House:
- Floor Amendment (Delegate Hornberger) {863222/1 Rejected (53-83)
- Floor Amendment (Delegate Simonaire) {513222/1 Rejected (56-78)
- Floor Amendment (Delegate Afzali) {343521/1 Rejected (53-81)
- Floor Amendment (Delegate Rey) {553923/2 Rejected (52-83)
- Floor Amendment (Delegate Rey) {643422/3 Rejected (50-82)
- Special Order until 3/10 (Delegate Flanagan) Adopted
On March 8, 2016 in the House:
- Favorable with Amendments {644169/1 Report Adopted
- Special Order until 03/09 (Delegate Szeliga) Adopted
On March 7, 2016 in the House:
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
On February 17, 2016 in the House:
- Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
On February 10, 2016 in the House:
- First Reading Appropriations
+ − Amendments (10)
+ − Statute Amended
- 4-102 - Article - Criminal Law
+ − Votes (9)
March 12, 2016: House Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 81
- Nays: 54
March 11, 2016: House Floor - Floor Amendment (Flanagan) {693527/1 Rejected
- Yeas: 55
- Nays: 82
March 11, 2016: House Floor - Floor Amendment (S. Howard) {863923/1 Rejected
- Yeas: 59
- Nays: 78
March 9, 2016: House Floor - Floor Amendment (Rey) {643422/3 Rejected
- Yeas: 50
- Nays: 82
March 9, 2016: House Floor - Floor Amendment (Simonaire) {513222/1 Rejected
- Yeas: 56
- Nays: 78
March 9, 2016: House Floor - Floor Amendment (Rey) {553923/2 Rejected
- Yeas: 52
- Nays: 83
March 9, 2016: House Floor - Floor Amendment (Afzali) {343521/1 Rejected
- Yeas: 53
- Nays: 81
March 9, 2016: House Floor - Floor Amendment (Hornberger) {863222/1 Rejected
- Yeas: 53
- Nays: 83
March 7, 2016: House - Committee - Appropriations
+ − Sponsors (39)
Type:
Primary Sponsor