+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (16)
On April 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed with Amendments (46-0)
On April 7, 2016 in the Senate:
- Favorable with Amendments {138477/1
- Special Order until later today (Senator Zirkin) Adopted
- Favorable with Amendments {138477/1 Report Adopted
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
On April 6, 2016 in the Senate:
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
On March 21, 2016 in the Senate:
- First Reading Judicial Proceedings
On March 19, 2016 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (90-43)
On March 18, 2016 in the House:
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
- Favorable with Amendments {632910/1 Report Adopted
- Floor Amendment (Delegate Shoemaker) {243622/1 Rejected (52-82)
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
On February 12, 2016 in the House:
- Hearing cancelled
- Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
On February 10, 2016 in the House:
- First Reading Judiciary
- Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Statutes Amended (5)
+ − Votes (4)
April 6, 2016: Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
March 18, 2016: House - Committee - Judiciary
March 17, 2016: House Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 90
- Nays: 43
March 16, 2016: House Floor - Floor Amendment (Shoemaker) {243622/1 Rejected
- Yeas: 52
- Nays: 82
+ − Sponsors (65)
Type:
Primary Sponsor