+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (24)
On May 13, 2019 in the House:
- Approved by the Governor - Chapter 526
On April 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed (45-0)
- Conference Committee Report Adopted
On April 8, 2019 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (118-18)
- Conference Committee Report Adopted
- Passed Enrolled
On April 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senators Hough, Washington, and Waldstreicher
- Conference Committee Appointed
- Senate Refuses to Recede
On April 4, 2019 in the House:
- House Requests Senate Recede
- House Refuses to Concur - Senate Amendments
- Conference Committee Appointed
- Delegates Moon, D.M. Davis, and Malone
On April 3, 2019 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed with Amendments (42-0)
On April 2, 2019 in the Senate:
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Favorable with Amendments 288978/1 Report Adopted
On April 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
On March 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- First Reading Judicial Proceedings
On March 18, 2019 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (136-3)
On March 16, 2019 in the House:
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Favorable with Amendments 432719/1 Report Adopted
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
On February 11, 2019 in the House:
- Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
On February 8, 2019 in the House:
- First Reading Judiciary
+ − Analyses (2)
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Statute Amended
- 9-614 - Article - Correctional Services
+ − Votes (4)
April 1, 2019: House Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 118
- Nays: 18
April 1, 2019: Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
April 1, 2019: Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 45
March 16, 2019: House - Committee - Judiciary
+ − Sponsors (33)
Type:
Primary Sponsor