+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (31)
On May 25, 2017 in the House:
- Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
On April 5, 2017 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (87-53)
- House Concur - Senate Amendments
- Passed Enrolled
On April 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed with Amendments (29-18)
- Floor Committee Amendment {717671/1 Adopted
On March 31, 2017 in the Senate:
- Favorable with Amendments {707175/1 Report Adopted
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
- Floor Amendment {673625/1 (Senator Jennings) Adopted
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
On March 14, 2017 in the Senate:
- Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
On March 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- First Reading Finance
On March 3, 2017 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (88-51)
On March 1, 2017 in the House:
- Floor Amendment {143223/1 (Delegate Carozza) Rejected (53-84)
- Floor Amendment {873520/1 (Delegate Cluster) Rejected (53-85)
- Floor Amendment {343529/1 (Delegate Afzali) Rejected (50-88)
- Floor Amendment {303922/1 (Delegate Afzali) Rejected (52-87)
- Floor Amendment {973927/1 (Delegate McKay) Rejected (51-88)
- Floor Amendment (Delegate Flanagan) Rejected (48-89)
- Floor Amendment {373125/1 (Delegate Jacobs) Rejected (50-86)
- Floor Amendment {543829/1 (Delegate Malone) Rejected (48-89)
- Floor Amendment {103227/1 (Delegate Flanagan)
- Motion vote previous question (Delegate Ebersole) Adopted
- Floor Amendment {953926/1 (Delegate McMillan) Rejected
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
On February 27, 2017 in the House:
- Special Order until 3/1 (Delegate Kipke) Adopted
- Favorable with Amendments {323090/1 Report Adopted
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
On January 25, 2017 in the House:
- Hearing 2/10 at 12:30 p.m.
On January 11, 2017 in the House:
- First Reading Economic Matters
On September 29, 2016 in the House:
- Pre-filed
+ − Amendments (13)
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
+ − Votes (12)
March 31, 2017: Senate - Committee - Finance
March 29, 2017: House Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 87
- Nays: 53
March 28, 2017: Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed with Amendments
- Yeas: 29
- Nays: 18
March 1, 2017: House Floor - Floor Amendment {343529/1 (Delegate Afzali) Rejected
- Yeas: 50
- Nays: 88
March 1, 2017: House Floor - Floor Amendment {373125/1 (Delegate Jacobs) Rejected
- Yeas: 50
- Nays: 86
March 1, 2017: House Floor - Floor Amendment {543829/1 (Delegate Malone) Rejected
- Yeas: 48
- Nays: 89
March 1, 2017: House Floor - Floor Amendment {973927/1 (Delegate McKay) Rejected
- Yeas: 51
- Nays: 88
March 1, 2017: House Floor - Floor Amendment (Delegate Flanagan) Rejected
- Yeas: 48
- Nays: 89
March 1, 2017: House Floor - Floor Amendment {873520/1 (Delegate Cluster) Rejected
- Yeas: 53
- Nays: 85
March 1, 2017: House Floor - Floor Amendment {143223/1 (Delegate Carozza) Rejected
- Yeas: 53
- Nays: 84
March 1, 2017: House Floor - Floor Amendment {303922/1 (Delegate Afzali) Rejected
- Yeas: 52
- Nays: 87
February 27, 2017: House - Committee - Economic Matters
+ − Sponsors (79)
Type:
Primary Sponsor