+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On January 31, 2011 in the House:
- Incorporated by Courts of Justice (HB1434-Garrett) by voice vote
On January 24, 2011 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends incorporating (HB1434-Garrett) by voice vote
On January 21, 2011 in the House:
- Assigned Courts sub: #1 Criminal
On January 13, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Referred from Health, Welfare and Institutions by voice vote
On December 10, 2010 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/11 11100528D
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor