+ − Full Texts (11)
+ − Actions (13)
On October 16, 2013 in the Senate:
- Approved P.L.2013, c.168.
On August 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (36-0)
On July 29, 2013 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate, 2nd Reading on Concurrence
On June 27, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Concur by Assembly Amendments (Eustace) (73-0-0)
- Received in the Assembly, 2nd Reading on Concurrence
On June 27, 2013 in the Senate:
- Passed by the Senate (38-0)
- Substituted for S2543 (1R)
On June 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
On April 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee
On March 21, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Passed by the Assembly (77-0-0)
On February 14, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Assembly Floor Amendment Passed (Eustace)
On January 17, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
On January 10, 2012 in the Assembly:
- Introduced, Referred to Assembly Judiciary Committee
+ − Votes (7)
August 19, 2013: CONCUR ASMB AMEND
- Yeas: 36
- Present/NV: 4
June 27, 2013: CONCUR BY AMEND
- Yeas: 73
- Present/NV: 7
June 27, 2013: 3RDG FINAL PASSAGE
- Yeas: 38
- Present/NV: 2
June 27, 2013: SUBSTITUTE FOR S2543
- Present/NV: 40
June 6, 2013: r/Sca
- Yeas: 11
- Present/NV: 2
March 21, 2013: 3RDG FINAL PASSAGE
- Yeas: 77
- Present/NV: 3
January 17, 2013: r/Aca
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 1