+ − Summary
+ − Actions (26)
On April 13, 2016 in the House:
- In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- Special Sentiment Calendar ADOPTED.
On April 12, 2016 in the Senate:
- Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence
- ADOPTED
- Taken from the table by the President
On April 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- Unfinished Business
On April 7, 2016 in the Senate:
- Unfinished Business
On April 6, 2016 in the Senate:
- Unfinished Business
On April 5, 2016 in the Senate:
- Unfinished Business
On April 4, 2016 in the Senate:
- Unfinished Business
On April 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- Unfinished Business
On March 31, 2016 in the Senate:
- Unfinished Business
On March 30, 2016 in the Senate:
- Unfinished Business
On March 29, 2016 in the Senate:
- Unfinished Business
On March 28, 2016 in the Senate:
- Unfinished Business
On March 24, 2016 in the Senate:
- Unfinished Business
On March 23, 2016 in the Senate:
- Unfinished Business
On March 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- Unfinished Business
On March 17, 2016 in the Senate:
- Unfinished Business
On March 16, 2016 in the Senate:
- Unfinished Business
On March 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- Unfinished Business
On March 10, 2016 in the Senate:
- Unfinished Business
On March 9, 2016 in the Senate:
- Unfinished Business
On March 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- Unfinished Business
- On motion by Senator BREEN of Cumberland Tabled until Later in Today's Session, pending ADOPTION
- READ
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor