+ − Summary
+ − Actions (12)
On January 26, 2016 in the House:
- In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- Special Sentiment Calendar PASSED.
On January 21, 2016 in the Senate:
- Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence
- On motion by Senator VOLK of Cumberland PASSED
- Taken from the table by the President
On January 19, 2016 in the Senate:
- Unfinished Business
On January 14, 2016 in the Senate:
- Unfinished Business
On January 12, 2016 in the Senate:
- Unfinished Business
On January 7, 2016 in the Senate:
- (Unfinished Business)
On January 6, 2016 in the Senate:
- Unfinished Business
- On motion by Senator VOLK of Cumberland Tabled until Later in Today's Session, pending PASSAGE
- READ