+ − Summary
+ − Actions (12)
On March 3, 2015 in the House:
- In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- Special Sentiment Calendar PASSED.
On February 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence.
- PASSED
- Taken from the table by the President
On February 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Unfinished Business
On February 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- Unfinished Business
On February 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Unfinished Business
On February 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- (Unfinished Business)
On February 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- Unfinished Business
- On motion by Senator KATZ of Kennebec Tabled until Later in Today's Session, pending PASSAGE
- READ