+ − Summary
+ − Actions (24)
On April 11, 2014 in the House:
- In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- Special Sentiment Calendar PASSED.
On April 10, 2014 in the Senate:
- Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence.
- Subsequently, PASSED
- TAKEN from the Table by the President Pro Tem.
On April 9, 2014 in the Senate:
- Unfinished Business
On April 8, 2014 in the Senate:
- Unfinished Business
On April 7, 2014 in the Senate:
- Unfinished Business
On April 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- Unfinished Business
On April 3, 2014 in the Senate:
- Unfinished Business
On April 2, 2014 in the Senate:
- Unfinished Business
On April 1, 2014 in the Senate:
- Unfinished Business
On March 31, 2014 in the Senate:
- Unfinished Business
On March 28, 2014 in the Senate:
- Unfinished Business
On March 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- Unfinished Business
On March 26, 2014 in the Senate:
- Unfinished Business
On March 25, 2014 in the Senate:
- Unfinished Business
On March 24, 2014 in the Senate:
- (Unfinished Business)
On March 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- (Unfinished Business)
On March 20, 2014 in the Senate:
- (Unfinished Business)
On March 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- (Unfinished Business)
On March 18, 2014 in the Senate:
- Unfinished Business
- On motion by Senator MILLETT of Cumberland Tabled until Later in Today's Session, pending PASSAGE
- READ