+ − Summary
+ − Actions (14)
On May 27, 2015 in the House:
- In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- Special Sentiment Calendar ADOPTED.
On May 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence.
- ADOPTED
- Taken from the table by the President
On May 21, 2015 in the Senate:
- Unfinished Business
On May 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Unfinished Business
On May 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- Unfinished Business
On May 14, 2015 in the Senate:
- Unfinished Business
On May 13, 2015 in the Senate:
- Unfinished Business
On May 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- Unfinished Business
On May 7, 2015 in the Senate:
- Unfinished Business
- On motion by Senator MILLETT of Cumberland Tabled until Later in Today's Session, pending ADOPTION
- READ