+ − Summary
+ − Actions (10)
On May 13, 2015 in the House:
- In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- Special Sentiment Calendar PASSED.
On May 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence.
- PASSED
- Taken from the table by the President
On May 7, 2015 in the Senate:
- Unfinished Business
On May 6, 2015 in the Senate:
- Unfinished Business
On May 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- Unfinished Business
- On motion by Senator GRATWICK of Penobscot Tabled until Later in Today's Session, pending PASSAGE
- READ