+ − Summary
+ − Actions (37)
On June 17, 2015 in the House:
- In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- Special Sentiment Calendar PASSED.
On June 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence.
- PASSED
- Taken from the table by the President
On June 15, 2015 in the Senate:
- Unfinished Business
On June 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- Unfinished Business
On June 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Unfinished Business
On June 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Unfinished Business
On June 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- Unfinished Business
On June 8, 2015 in the Senate:
- Unfinished Business
On June 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- Unfinished Business
On June 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- Unfinished Business
On June 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- Unfinished Business
On June 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- Unfinished Business
On June 1, 2015 in the Senate:
- Unfinished Business
On May 29, 2015 in the Senate:
- Unfinished Business
On May 28, 2015 in the Senate:
- Unfinished Business
On May 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- Unfinished Business
On May 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Unfinished Business
On May 21, 2015 in the Senate:
- Unfinished Business
On May 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Unfinished Business
On May 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- Unfinished Business
On May 14, 2015 in the Senate:
- Unfinished Business
On May 13, 2015 in the Senate:
- Unfinished Business
On May 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- Unfinished Business
On May 7, 2015 in the Senate:
- Unfinished Business
On May 6, 2015 in the Senate:
- Unfinished Business
On May 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- Unfinished Business
On April 30, 2015 in the Senate:
- Unfinished Business
On April 29, 2015 in the Senate:
- Unfinished Business
On April 28, 2015 in the Senate:
- Unfinished Business
On April 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Unfinished Business
On April 21, 2015 in the Senate:
- Unfinished Business
On April 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Unfinished Business
- On motion by Senator BREEN of Cumberland Tabled until Later in Today's Session, pending PASSAGE
- READ