+ − Summary
+ − Actions (14)
On May 9, 2013 in the House:
- In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- Special Sentiment Calendar PASSED.
On May 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence.
- On motion by Senator PATRICK of Oxford, PASSED.
- TAKEN from the Table by the President.
On May 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- (Unfinished Business)
On May 2, 2013 in the Senate:
- (Unfinished Business)
On May 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- (Unfinished Business)
On April 30, 2013 in the Senate:
- (Unfinished Business)
On April 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- (Unfinished Business)
- (Unfinished Business)
On April 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- (Unfinished Business)
- On further motion by same Senator, Tabled Until Later in Today's Session pending the motion by same Senator to PASS.
- On motion by Senator PATRICK of Oxford, READ.
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor