+ − Summary
+ − Actions (45)
On June 10, 2015 in the House:
- In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- Subsequently, the Sentiment was PASSED.
- Speaker laid before the House
On June 9, 2015 in the House:
- Unfinished Business
On June 8, 2015 in the House:
- Unfinished Business
On June 5, 2015 in the House:
- Unfinished Business
On June 4, 2015 in the House:
- Unfinished Business
On June 3, 2015 in the House:
- Unfinished Business
On June 2, 2015 in the House:
- Unfinished Business
On June 1, 2015 in the House:
- Unfinished Business
On May 29, 2015 in the House:
- Unfinished Business
On May 28, 2015 in the House:
- Unfinished Business
On May 27, 2015 in the House:
- Unfinished Business
On May 26, 2015 in the House:
- Unfinished Business
On May 21, 2015 in the House:
- Unfinished Business
On May 20, 2015 in the House:
- Unfinished Business
On May 19, 2015 in the House:
- Unfinished Business
On May 14, 2015 in the House:
- Unfinished Business
On May 13, 2015 in the House:
- Unfinished Business
On May 12, 2015 in the House:
- Unfinished Business
On May 7, 2015 in the House:
- Unfinished Business
On May 6, 2015 in the House:
- Unfinished Business
On May 5, 2015 in the House:
- Unfinished Business
On April 30, 2015 in the House:
- Unfinished Business
On April 29, 2015 in the House:
- Unfinished Business
On April 28, 2015 in the House:
- Unfinished Business
On April 23, 2015 in the House:
- Unfinished Business
On April 21, 2015 in the House:
- Unfinished Business
On April 16, 2015 in the House:
- Unfinished Business
On April 14, 2015 in the House:
- Unfinished Business
On April 9, 2015 in the House:
- Unfinished Business
On April 7, 2015 in the House:
- Unfinished Business
On April 2, 2015 in the House:
- Unfinished Business
On April 1, 2015 in the House:
- Unfinished Business
On March 31, 2015 in the House:
- Unfinished Business
On March 26, 2015 in the House:
- Unfinished Business
On March 25, 2015 in the House:
- Unfinished Business
On March 24, 2015 in the House:
- Unfinished Business
- Later today assigned.
- On motion of Representative BURSTEIN of Lincolnville, TABLED pending PASSAGE.
- READ.
- On OBJECTION of Representative BURSTEIN of Lincolnville REMOVED.
- SPECIAL SENTIMENT CALENDAR
On March 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence.
- READ and PASSED.
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor