+ − Summary
+ − Actions (11)
On March 29, 2016 in the House:
- In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- Special Sentiment Calendar PASSED.
On March 28, 2016 in the Senate:
- Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence
- PASSED
- Taken from the table by the President
On March 24, 2016 in the Senate:
- Unfinished Business
On March 23, 2016 in the Senate:
- Unfinished Business
On March 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- Unfinished Business
On March 17, 2016 in the Senate:
- Unfinished Business
- On motion by Senator SAVIELLO of Franklin Tabled until Later in Today's Session, pending PASSAGE
- READ
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor