+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (52)
On May 2, 2014 in the Senate:
- In possession of the Senate when the Senate ADJOURNED SINE DIE and PLACED IN THE LEGISLATIVE FILES (DEAD).
On February 18, 2014 in the Senate:
- On motion by Senator MAZUREK of Knox PLACED ON THE SPECIAL HIGHWAY TABLE pending ENACTMENT , in concurrence.
On February 13, 2014 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- PASSED TO BE ENACTED.
On February 11, 2014 in the House:
- In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "B" (S-381).
- CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY.
- Under suspension of the rules
- CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY
On February 6, 2014 in the Senate:
- Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence.
- Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "B" (S-381).
- Committee Amendment "B" (S-381) READ and ADOPTED.
- READ ONCE.
- Report READ and ACCEPTED.
On July 10, 2013 in the Senate:
- CARRIED OVER to any Special or Regular Session of the 126th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 1145.
On July 9, 2013 in the House:
- Carried over to any special and/or regular session of the 126th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 1145.
On June 26, 2013 in the House:
- In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- The House RECEDED and CONCURRED to COMMITTING the Bill and accompanying papers to the Committee on TAXATION.
On June 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence.
- On motion by Same Senator Bill and accompanying papers COMMITTED to the Committee on Taxation , in NON-CONCURRENCE.
- On motion by Senator MAZUREK of Knox taken from the Special Highway Table
On June 3, 2013 in the Senate:
- On motion by Senator MAZUREK of Knox, PLACED ON THE SPECIAL HIGHWAY TABLE, pending ENACTMENT, in concurrence.
- TAKEN from the Table by the President.
- On motion by Senator KATZ of Kennebec TABLED until Later in Today's Session, pending ENACTMENT, in concurrence.
On May 31, 2013 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- PASSED TO BE ENACTED.
On May 28, 2013 in the House:
- (Yeas 139 - Nays 0 - Absent 12 - Excused 0)
- Speaker laid before the House
- Subsequently, The Committee Report was ACCEPTED.
- ROLL CALL NO. 138
- In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- The Bill was READ ONCE.
- Committee Amendment "A" (S-109) was READ and ADOPTED.
- Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading.
- The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-109).
On May 23, 2013 in the House:
- Unfinished Business
On May 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Report READ and ACCEPTED.
- READ ONCE.
- Committee Amendment "A" (S-109) READ and ADOPTED.
- Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-109)
- Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence.
On May 22, 2013 in the House:
- CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY
- On OBJECTION of Representative BERRY of Bowdoinham REMOVED.
- The Committee Report was READ.
- On motion of Representative BERRY of Bowdoinham, TABLED pending ACCEPTANCE of the Committee Report.
- Later today assigned.
- Unfinished Business
On March 12, 2013 in the House:
- In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- Bill REFERRED to the Committee on TAXATION.
On March 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence.
- On motion by Senator Haskell of Cumberland REFERRED to the Committee on TAXATION
- Committee on TAXATION suggested and ordered printed
+ − Amendment
+ − Vote
May 28, 2013: Acc Ought to Pass as Amend Rep
- Yeas: 139
- Absent: 12
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor