+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (95)
On April 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD).
- Same Senator moved to Under suspension of the Rules, RECONSIDER ADOPTION of Senate Amendment "B" (S-514) INDEFINITELY POSTPONE the same FAILED
- TAKEN from the Special Appropriations Table by Senator Hill of York.
- On motion by Senator LANGLEY of Hancock Under suspension of the Rules, The Senate RECONSIDERED PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED As Amended by Senate Amendment "B" (S-514)
- 21 Yeas - 14 Nays- 0 Excused - 0 Absent FAILED
- Roll Call Ordered Roll Call # 600 16 Yeas - 19 Nays- 0 Excused - 0 Absent FAILED
- FAILED ENACTMENT (Emergency 2/3 Elected Required , in concurrence.
- Roll Call Ordered Roll Call # 601
- Subsequently, PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Senate Amendment "B" (S-514) , in concurrence.
On April 16, 2014 in the Senate:
- Unfinished Business
- On motion by Senator JACKSON of Aroostook Tabled until Later in Today's Session, pending (Emergency -2/3 Elected Required) , in NON-CONCURRENCE.
On April 15, 2014 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- Subsequently, FAILED PASSAGE TO BE ENACTED.
- Speaker laid before the House
- Later today assigned.
- On motion of Representative McCABE of Skowhegan, TABLED pending PASSAGE TO BE ENACTED.
On April 14, 2014 in the House:
- (Yeas 91 - Nays 56 - Absent 4 - Excused 0)
- Speaker laid before the House
- Subsequently, On motion of Representative MacDONALD of Boothbay, the Majority Ought to Pass Report was ACCEPTED.
- ROLL CALL NO. 704
- The Bill was READ ONCE.
- In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- Senate Amendment "B" (S-514) was READ and ADOPTED.
- Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading.
- The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Senate Amendment "B" (S-514).
On April 11, 2014 in the House:
- Unfinished Business
On April 10, 2014 in the House:
- Unfinished Business
- Later today assigned.
- On motion of Representative BERRY of Bowdoinham TABLED pending ACCEPTANCE of Either Report.
- Reports READ.
On April 9, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senator MILLETT of Cumberland moved ACCEPTANCE of Majority Ought to Pass Report
- On further motion by same Senator, TABLED until Later in Today's Session, pending her motion to ACCEPT the Majority Ought to Pass Report.
- TAKEN from the Table by the President.
- Subsequently, Majority Ought to Pass Report ACCEPTED
- READ ONCE
- Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME
- PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Senate Amendment "B" (S-514)
- Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence.
- On motion by Senator MILLETT of Cumberland Senate Amendment "B" (S-514) READ and ADOPTED
On July 10, 2013 in the Senate:
- CARRIED OVER to any Special or Regular Session of the 126th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 1145.
On July 9, 2013 in the House:
- Carried over to any special and/or regular session of the 126th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 1145.
On June 17, 2013 in the House:
- ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- The House RECEDED and CONCURRED to COMMITTING the Bill and accompanying papers to the Committee on EDUCATION AND CULTURAL AFFAIRS.
On June 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- Roll Call Number 284
- TAKEN from the Table by the President.
- On motion by Senator GOODALL of Sagadahoc, Bill and accompanying papers COMMITTED to the Committee on Education and Cultural Affairs, in NON-CONCURRENCE. (Roll Call Ordered)
- (22 -Yeas, 12 -Nays, 1 -Excused, 0 -Absent)
- PREVAILED
- Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence.
On June 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- On motion by Senator KATZ of Kennebec TABLED until Later in Today's Session, pending the motion by Senator GOODALL of Sagadahoc to COMMIT Bill and accompanying papers to the Committee on Education and Cultural Affairs, in NON-CONCURRENCE.
- Senator GOODALL of Sagadahoc moved to COMMIT Bill and accompanying papers to the Committee on Education and Cultural Affairs, in NON-CONCURRENCE.
- FAILED
- (20 -Yeas, 15 -Nays, 0 -Excused, 0 -Absent)
- Roll Call Number 279
- Motion by MILLETT of Cumberland Senator to SUSPEND THE RULES to RECONSIDER FAILED. (Objection to Motion to Suspend the Rules) (Roll Call Ordered)
- TAKEN from the Table by the President.
On June 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- (Unfinished Business)
On June 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- TAKEN from the Table by the President.
- On motion by Senator GOODALL of Sagadahoc TABLED until Later in Today's Session, pending the motion by Senator MILLETT of Cumberland to SUSPEND THE RULES TO RECONSIDER.
- Senator MILLETT of Cumberland moved to SUSPEND THE RULES (Objection to Motion to Suspend the Rules)
- (Unfinished Business)
On June 10, 2013 in the Senate:
- On motion by Senator JACKSON of Aroostook TABLED until Later in Today's Session, pending ENACTMENT, in NON-CONCURRENCE.
On June 10, 2013 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- (Yeas 87 - Nays 54 - Absent 10 - Excused 0)
- ROLL CALL NO. 241
- This being an emergency measure, a two-thirds vote of all the members elected to the House being necessary, a total was taken.
- FAILED PASSAGE TO BE ENACTED.
On June 5, 2013 in the House:
- Reports READ.
- On motion of Representative MacDONALD of Boothbay, the Majority Ought to Pass Report was ACCEPTED.
- ROLL CALL NO. 193
- The Bill was READ ONCE.
- (Yeas 89 - Nays 57 - Absent 5 - Excused 0)
- Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading.
- The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED.
- In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
On June 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence.
- Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED.
- READ ONCE.
- PREVAILED
- (22 -Yeas, 13 -Nays, 0 -Excused, 0 -Absent)
- Roll Call Number 154
- On motion by Senator MILLETT of Cumberland, the Majority Ought to Pass Report ACCEPTED . (Remarks Made) (Roll Call Ordered)
- TAKEN from the Table by the President.
On June 3, 2013 in the Senate:
- (Unfinished Business)
On May 31, 2013 in the Senate:
- (Unfinished Business)
On May 30, 2013 in the Senate:
- (Unfinished Business)
On May 29, 2013 in the Senate:
- (Unfinished Business)
- On further motion by same Senator, TABLED until Later in Today's Session, pending her motion to ACCEPT the Majority Ought to Pass Report.
- Senator MILLETT of Cumberland moved to ACCEPT the Majority Ought to Pass Report.
- Reports READ.
On March 12, 2013 in the House:
- In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- Bill REFERRED to the Committee on EDUCATION AND CULTURAL AFFAIRS.
On March 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence.
- On motion by Senator Millett of Cumberland REFERRED to the Committee on EDUCATION AND CULTURAL AFFAIRS
- Committee on EDUCATION AND CULTURAL AFFAIRS suggested and ordered printed
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (9)
April 17, 2014: ENACT-EMER 2/3 ELECT
- Yeas: 21
- Nays: 14
April 17, 2014: RECONSIDER
- Yeas: 16
- Nays: 19
April 14, 2014: ACC MAJ OUGHT TO PASS REP
- Yeas: 91
- Nays: 56
- Absent: 4
June 14, 2013: RECOMMIT BILL & PAPERS
- Yeas: 22
- Nays: 12
- Present/NV: 1
June 14, 2013: COMMIT BILL AND PAPERS TO EDU
- Yeas: 22
- Nays: 12
- Present/NV: 1
June 13, 2013: RECOMMIT BILL & PAPERS
- Yeas: 20
- Nays: 15
June 10, 2013: Enactment - Emer
- Yeas: 87
- Nays: 54
- Absent: 10
June 5, 2013: ACC MAJ OUGHT TO PASS REP
- Yeas: 89
- Nays: 57
- Absent: 5
June 4, 2013: ACCEPT MAJ OTP RPT
- Yeas: 22
- Nays: 13
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor