+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (22)
On May 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- FINALLY PASSED, in concurrence.
On May 20, 2013 in the House:
- (Yeas 124 - Nays 15 - Absent 12 - Excused 0)
- ROLL CALL NO. 103
- FINALLY PASSED.
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
On May 15, 2013 in the House:
- CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY
On May 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- COMMITTEE ON BILLS IN THE SECOND READING REPORTS NO FURTHER VERBAL AMENDMENTS NECESSARY, Senator Cleveland, Senate Chair. REPORT ACCEPTED.
- Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence.
- READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-78).
On May 15, 2013 in the House:
- Under suspension of the rules
- CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY.
- The Resolve was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-78)
- In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
On May 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- ASSIGNED FOR SECOND READING NEXT LEGISLATIVE DAY.
- Committee Amendment "A" (S-78) READ and ADOPTED.
- READ ONCE.
- Report READ and ACCEPTED.
On March 12, 2013 in the House:
- In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- Resolve REFERRED to the Committee on TRANSPORTATION.
On March 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence.
- On motion by Senator Mazurek of Knox REFERRED to the Committee on TRANSPORTATION
- Committee on TRANSPORTATION suggested and ordered printed
+ − Amendment
+ − Vote
May 20, 2013: Final Passage
- Yeas: 124
- Nays: 15
- Absent: 12
+ − Sponsors (7)
Type:
Primary Sponsor