+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (15)
On April 28, 2021 in the Senate:
- Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
- Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 140 Yeas 22 - Nays 12 - Excused 1 - Absent 0
- On motion by Senator GUERIN of Penobscot the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report ACCEPTED.
- Reports Read
On April 28, 2021 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- (Yeas 85 - Nays 58 - Absent 8 - Excused 0)
- ROLL CALL NO. 34
- On motion of Representative SYLVESTER of Portland, the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report was ACCEPTED.
- Reports READ.
On April 21, 2021 in the joint:
- Reported Out - ONTP/OTP-AM
On March 30, 2021 in the House:
- Carried over, in the same posture, to a subsequent special or regular session of the 130th Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order SP 435.
On March 26, 2021 in the joint:
- Voted - Divided Report
- Work Session Held
On January 11, 2021 in the House:
- The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on LABOR AND HOUSING pursuant to Joint Rule 308.2 and ordered printed pursuant to Joint Rule 401.
- Received by the Clerk of the House on January 11, 2021.
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (2)
April 28, 2021: ACC MAJ OUGHT NOT TO PASS REP
- Yeas: 85
- Nays: 58
- Absent: 8
April 28, 2021: ACCEPT MAJ ONTP RPT
- Yeas: 22
- Nays: 12
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsors (7)
Type:
Primary Sponsor