+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (18)
On July 10, 2013 in the Senate:
- In possession of the Senate when the Senate ADJOURNED SINE DIE and PLACED IN THE LEGISLATIVE FILES (DEAD).
On June 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- On motion by Senator CAIN of Penobscot, PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE, pending FINAL PASSAGE, in concurrence.
On June 12, 2013 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- FINALLY PASSED.
On June 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Ordered sent down forthwith.
- Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-431), in concurrence.
- Committee Amendment "A" (H-431) READ and ADOPTED, in concurrence.
- READ ONCE.
- Report READ and ACCEPTED, in concurrence.
On June 10, 2013 in the House:
- Under suspension of the rules
- CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY.
- The Resolve was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-431)
On March 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- On motion by Senator Craven of Androscoggin, REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, in concurrence.
On March 12, 2013 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- The Resolve was REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES.
- Committee on Health and Human Services suggested and ordered printed.
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor