+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (40)
On July 2, 2021 in the Senate:
- Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
- On motion by Senator VITELLI of Sagadahoc The Senate ADHERED To FAILED PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "B" (H-728) as Amended by Senate Amendment "C" (S-359) thereto In NON-CONCURRENCE
On July 1, 2021 in the House:
- ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- The House INSISTED on ACCEPTANCE of REPORT A Ought to Pass as Amended . and PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-727)
On June 30, 2021 in the Senate:
- Sent down for concurrence
- Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 473 Yeas 14 - Nays 18 - Excused 3 - Absent 0
- PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "B" (H-728) as Amended by Senate Amendment "C" (S-359) thereto In NON-CONCURRENCE FAILED
- Committee Amendment "B" (H-728) as Amended by Senate Amendment "C" (S-359) thereto ADOPTED
- On motion by Same Senator Senate Amendment "C" (S-359) to Committee Amendment "B" (H-728) READ and ADOPTED
- Senator LAWRENCE of York asked and received leave of the Senate to Withdraw their motion. to ADOPT Senate Amendment "A" (S-348) to Committee Amendment "A" (H-727)
- Taken from the table by the President
On June 18, 2021 in the Senate:
- READ ONCE
- Reports READ
- On motion by Senator DESCHAMBAULT of York Report C Ought to Pass As Amended by Committee Amendment "B" (H-728) ACCEPTED
- Unfinished Business
- Committee Amendment "B" (H-728) READ
- On motion by Senator LAWRENCE of York Senate Amendment "A" (S-348) to Committee Amendment "B" (H-728)
- On motion by Senator VITELLI of Sagadahoc Tabled until Later in Today's Session, pending ADOPTION of Senate Amendment "A" (S-348) to Committee Amendment "B" (H-728) In NON-CONCURRENCE
On June 17, 2021 in the House:
- Reports READ.
- On motion of Representative WARREN of Hallowell, REPORT A Ought to Pass as Amended was ACCEPTED.
- (Yeas 77 - Nays 62 - Absent 12 - Excused 0)
- ROLL CALL NO. 365
- The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-727).
- The Bill was READ ONCE.
- Committee Amendment "A" (H-727) was READ and ADOPTED.
- Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading.
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
On June 17, 2021 in the joint:
- Reported Out - OTP-AM/ONTP/OTP-AM
On June 4, 2021 in the joint:
- Voted - Divided Report
- Work Session Reconsidered
On May 25, 2021 in the joint:
- Work Session Held
- Voted - Divided Report
On May 24, 2021 in the joint:
- Work Session Held - TABLED
On May 17, 2021 in the joint:
- Work Session Held - TABLED
On May 5, 2021 in the joint:
- Work Session Held - TABLED
On March 30, 2021 in the House:
- Carried over, in the same posture, to a subsequent special or regular session of the 130th Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order SP 435.
On March 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on CRIMINAL JUSTICE AND PUBLIC SAFETY in concurrence
On March 10, 2021 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on CRIMINAL JUSTICE AND PUBLIC SAFETY.
- Committee on Criminal Justice and Public Safety suggested and ordered printed.
+ − Amendment
+ − Statutes Amended (9)
- Chapter null - 17-A section 1107-A, sub-section 1-A
- Chapter null - 17-A section 1106-A, sub-section 2
- Chapter null - 17-A section 1126, sub-section 2
- Chapter null - 17-A section 1126, sub-section 1
- Chapter null - 17-A section 1107-A, sub-section 1-C
- Chapter null - 17-A section 1107-A, sub-section 1-B
- Chapter null - 17-A section 1107-A, sub-section 1
- Chapter null - 17-A section 1107-A, sub-section 4
- Chapter null - 17-A section 1902, sub-section 5
+ − Votes (2)
June 30, 2021: PASS TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMEND
- Yeas: 14
- Nays: 18
- Present/NV: 3
June 17, 2021: ACC REPORT 'A' OTP as amend
- Yeas: 77
- Nays: 62
- Absent: 12