+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (24)
On June 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- Veto Overridden
On June 22, 2017 in the House:
- Sent to the Engrossing Department.
- In concurrence.
- 126 having voted in the affirmative and 17 in the negative, with 8 being absent, and 0 excused, and accordingly it was the vote of the House that the Resolve become a law notwithstanding the objections of the Governor, since two-thirds of the members of the House so voted.
- ROLL CALL NO. 377V
- This Resolve, having been returned by the Governor, together with objections to the same pursuant to Article IV, Part Third, Section 2 of the Constitution of the State of Maine, after reconsideration, the House proceeded to vote on the question: "Shall this Resolve become a law notwithstanding the objections of the Governor?"
- Ordered Sent Forthwith.
On June 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence
- LD 957 In Senate, June 21, 2017, this Bill, having been returned by the Governor, together with objections to the same pursuant to the provisions of the Constitution of the State of Maine, after reconsideration, the Senate proceeded to vote on the question: "Shall this Bill become a law notwithstanding the objections of the Governor?" 34 IN FAVOR and 0 AGAINST, accordingly it was the vote of the Senate that the Bill become law and the VETO was OVERRIDDEN.
On June 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- FINALLY PASSED, in concurrence.
On June 8, 2017 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- FINALLY PASSED.
On June 7, 2017 in the House:
- CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY
- In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- Under suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY.
- The Resolve was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-192).
On June 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence.
- Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-192).
- Committee Amendment "A" (S-192) READ and ADOPTED.
- READ ONCE.
- Report READ and ACCEPTED.
On March 9, 2017 in the House:
- In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- The Resolve was REFERRED to the Committee on VETERANS AND LEGAL AFFAIRS.
On March 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Committee on VETERANS AND LEGAL AFFAIRS suggested and ordered printed REFERENCE to the Committee on VETERANS AND LEGAL AFFAIRS Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (2)
June 22, 2017: Reconsideration - Veto
- Yeas: 126
- Nays: 17
- Absent: 8
June 21, 2017: Reconsideration - Veto
- Yeas: 34
- Present/NV: 1