+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (39)
On August 2, 2017 in the Senate:
- Veto Overridden
On August 2, 2017 in the House:
- In concurrence. Sent to the Engrossing Department.
- 114 having voted in the affirmative and 23 in the negative, with 13 being absent, and 1 excused, and accordingly it was the vote of the House that the Bill become a law notwithstanding the objections of the Governor, since two-thirds of the members of the House so voted.
- ROLL CALL NO. 458V
- This Bill, having been returned by the Governor, together with objections to the same pursuant to Article IV, Part Third, Section 2 of the Constitution of the State of Maine, after reconsideration, the House proceeded to vote on the question: "Shall this Bill become a law notwithstanding the objections of the Governor?"
On August 2, 2017 in the Senate:
- Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence
- LD 952 In Senate, August 2, 2017, this Bill, having been returned by the Governor, together with objections to the same pursuant to the provisions of the Constitution of the State of Maine, after reconsideration, the Senate proceeded to vote on the question: "Shall this Bill become a law notwithstanding the objections of the Governor?" 30 IN FAVOR and 4 AGAINST, accordingly it was the vote of the Senate that the Bill become law and the VETO was OVERRIDDEN.
On August 2, 2017 in the House:
- Ordered Sent Forthwith.
On July 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-106) as Amended by Senate Amendment "A" (S-331) thereto In NON-CONCURRENCE
- On motion by Same Senator Under suspension of the Rules The Senate RECONSIDERED PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED
- Under further suspension of the Rules On further motion by Same Senator RECONSIDERED whereby The Senate ADOPTED Committee Amendment "A" (S-106)
- On further motion by Same Senator Senate Amendment "A" (S-331) to Committee Amendment "A" (S-106) READ and ADOPTED
- Committee Amendment "A" (S-106) as Amended by Senate Amendment "A" (S-331) thereto ADOPTED
- On Motion by Senator HAMPER of Oxford taken from the SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE.
- Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence
On July 20, 2017 in the House:
- ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- PASSED TO BE ENACTED.
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
On July 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
On July 20, 2017 in the House:
- The House RECEDED and CONCURRED to PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-106) as Amended by Senate Amendment "A" (S-331) thereto.
On May 31, 2017 in the Senate:
- On motion by Senator KATZ of Kennebec PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE pending ENACTMENT
On May 30, 2017 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- PASSED TO BE ENACTED.
On May 24, 2017 in the House:
- Under suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY.
- CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY
- The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-106).
- In concurrence.
On May 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence.
- Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-106).
- Committee Amendment "A" (S-106) READ and ADOPTED.
- READ ONCE.
- Report READ and ACCEPTED.
On March 16, 2017 in the House:
- In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES.
On March 14, 2017 in the Senate:
- Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence
- On motion by Senator BRAKEY of Androscoggin The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES in concurrence
- Taken from the table by the President
On March 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Unfinished Business
- Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES suggested and ordered printed On motion by Senator CUSHING of Penobscot Tabled until Later in Today's Session, pending Motion by Senator BRAKEY of Androscoggin to REFER to the Committee on Health and Human Services
+ − Amendment
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
- Chapter 305 - 32 section 2212
- Chapter 305 - 32 section 2258-B
+ − Votes (2)
August 2, 2017: Reconsideration - Veto
- Yeas: 114
- Nays: 23
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 13
August 2, 2017: Reconsideration - Veto
- Yeas: 30
- Nays: 4
- Present/NV: 1