+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (31)
On June 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- Became Law without Governor's Signature
On May 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
On May 23, 2019 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- PASSED TO BE ENACTED.
On May 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- On motion by Senator LIBBY of Androscoggin The Senate RECEDED and CONCURRED With PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-70) AS AMENDED BY House Amendment "A" (H-279) thereto in concurrence
On May 16, 2019 in the House:
- ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- In NON-CONCURRENCE and sent for concurrence.
- Subsequently, the Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-70) as Amended by House Amendment "A" (H-279) thereto.
- Committee Amendment "A" (S-70) as Amended by House Amendment "A" (H-279) thereto was ADOPTED.
- On further motion of same Representative House Amendment "A" (H-279) to Committee Amendment "A" (S-70) was READ and ADOPTED.
- On further motion of the same Representative, under further SUSPENSION of the rules, the House RECONSIDERED ADOPTION of Committee Amendment "A" (S-70).
- On motion of Representative McLEAN of Gorham, under SUSPENSION of the rules, the House RECONSIDERED its action whereby the Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-70).
- Speaker laid before the House
On May 14, 2019 in the House:
- Unfinished Business
On May 9, 2019 in the House:
- Unfinished Business
On May 8, 2019 in the House:
- Unfinished Business
On May 7, 2019 in the House:
- Unfinished Business
- Later today assigned.
- On motion of Representative MOONEN of Portland, TABLED pending PASSAGE TO BE ENACTED.
On May 2, 2019 in the House:
- In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-70).
- Under suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY.
- CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY
On April 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence.
- Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-70).
- Committee Amendment "A" (S-70) READ and ADOPTED.
- READ ONCE.
- Report READ and ACCEPTED.
On February 21, 2019 in the House:
- In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on TRANSPORTATION.
On February 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee on TRANSPORTATION suggested and ordered printed REFERENCE to the Committee on TRANSPORTATION Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence
+ − Amendment
+ − Statutes Amended (8)
- Chapter null - 12 section 13156, sub-section 3
- Chapter null - 12 section 13051, sub-section 2, paragraph B
- Chapter null - 29-A section 201, sub-section 3, paragraph A
- Chapter null - 12 section 13105, sub-section 1, paragraph B
- Chapter 255 - 12 section 13156, sub-section 3
- Chapter 255 - 12 section 13051, sub-section 2, paragraph B
- Chapter 255 - 29-A section 201, sub-section 3, paragraph A
- Chapter 255 - 12 section 13105, sub-section 1, paragraph B
+ − Sponsors (5)
Geoffrey GRATWICK
Type:
Primary Sponsor