+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (65)
On April 20, 2022 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor
On April 15, 2022 in the Senate:
- PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
On April 14, 2022 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- PASSED TO BE ENACTED.
On April 14, 2022 in the Senate:
- On motion by Senator VITELLI of Sagadahoc The Senate RECEDED and CONCURRED With The Majority Ought to Pass As Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-905) as Amended by House Amendment "A" (H-996) thereto Report ACCEPTED AND PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-905) as Amended by House Amendment "A" (H-996) thereto in concurrence
On April 13, 2022 in the House:
- On further motion of same Representative House Amendment "A" (H-996) to Committee Amendment "A" (H-905) was READ and ADOPTED.
On April 13, 2022 in the Senate:
- Taken from the table by the President
- Subsequently The Minority Ought Not To Pass Report ACCEPTED In NON-CONCURRENCE
On April 13, 2022 in the House:
- On motion of Representative HASENFUS of Readfield, the House RECEDED.
On April 13, 2022 in the Senate:
- Sent down for concurrence
On April 13, 2022 in the House:
- ROLL CALL NO. 562
- Committee Amendment "A" (H-905) as Amended by House Amendment "A" (H-996) thereto was ADOPTED.
- ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- Subsequently, the Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-905) as Amended by House Amendment "A" (H-996) thereto
- In NON-CONCURRENCE and sent for concurrence.
- (Yeas 72 - Nays 54 - Absent 21 - Excused 0 - Vacant 4)
On April 12, 2022 in the Senate:
- Unfinished Business
On April 11, 2022 in the Senate:
- Unfinished Business
On April 7, 2022 in the Senate:
- On motion by Senator CARNEY of Cumberland the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report FAILED
- Reports Read
- Unfinished Business
- Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 704 Yeas 16 - Nays 16 - Excused 2 - Absent 0
- Subsequently The Minority Ought Not To Pass was moved
- On motion by Senator DAUGHTRY of Cumberland Tabled until Later in Today's Session, pending ACCEPTANCE of The Minority Ought Not To Pass Report
On April 5, 2022 in the House:
- (Yeas 74 - Nays 61 - Absent 12 - Excused 0 - Vacant 4)
- On motion of Representative HARNETT of Gardiner, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED.
- ROLL CALL NO. 517
- Reports READ.
- The Bill was READ ONCE.
- Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading.
- The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-905).
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- Committee Amendment "A" (H-905) was READ and ADOPTED.
On April 1, 2022 in the joint:
- Reported Out - OTP-AM/ONTP
On March 2, 2022 in the joint:
- Voted - Divided Report
- Work Session Held
On January 26, 2022 in the House:
- Subsequently, the Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on JUDICIARY.
- Reports READ.
- On motion of Representative PEBWORTH of Blue Hill, the Majority REFER to the Committee on JUDICIARY Report was ACCEPTED.
On January 26, 2022 in the Senate:
- On motion by Senator CURRY of Waldo The Majority REFERENCE to the Committee on JUDICIARY Report Accepted in concurrence
On January 26, 2022 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence.
On January 26, 2022 in the Senate:
- Reports READ
On January 26, 2022 in the joint:
- Referred To - JUD
On January 12, 2022 in the joint:
- Reported Out - REFERRED TO JUD/ONTP
On January 6, 2022 in the joint:
- Voted - Divided Report
- Work Session Held
On July 19, 2021 in the House:
- Carried over, in the same posture, to any special or regular session of the 130th Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order HP 1302.
On June 3, 2021 in the joint:
- Carry Over Approved
On May 21, 2021 in the joint:
- Carry Over Requested
On May 20, 2021 in the joint:
- Work Session Held - TABLED
On May 13, 2021 in the joint:
- Work Session Held - TABLED
On April 28, 2021 in the House:
- The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on INNOVATION, DEVELOPMENT, ECONOMIC ADVANCEMENT AND BUSINESS
- Report was READ and ACCEPTED.
- Representative HARNETT from the Committee on JUDICIARY Reporting that the Bill be REFERRED to the Committee on INNOVATION, DEVELOPMENT, ECONOMIC ADVANCEMENT AND BUSINESS.
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
On April 28, 2021 in the Senate:
- Report READ and ACCEPTED in concurrence
- REFERENCED to the Committee on INNOVATION, DEVELOPMENT, ECONOMIC ADVANCEMENT AND BUSINESS in concurrence
On April 7, 2021 in the joint:
- Reported Out - REFERRED TO IDEA
- Referred To - IDEA
On March 30, 2021 in the House:
- Carried over, in the same posture, to a subsequent special or regular session of the 130th Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order SP 435.
On March 25, 2021 in the joint:
- Work Session Held
On March 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on JUDICIARY in concurrence
On March 10, 2021 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on JUDICIARY.
- Committee on Judiciary suggested and ordered printed.
+ − Amendment
+ − Statute Amended
- Chapter 644 - 4 section 9-C
+ − Votes (3)
April 13, 2022: ADOPT HAH-996 TO CAH-905
- Yeas: 72
- Nays: 54
- Absent: 21
April 7, 2022: ACCEPT MAJ OTP-A RPT
- Yeas: 16
- Nays: 16
- Present/NV: 2
April 5, 2022: ACC MAJ OTP AS AMENDED REP
- Yeas: 74
- Nays: 61
- Absent: 12