+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (18)
On June 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
- Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 258 Yeas 18 - Nays 13 - Excused 4 - Absent 0
- On motion by Senator BRENNER of Cumberland The Majority Ought Not To Pass Report ACCEPTED in concurrence
- Reports READ
On June 8, 2021 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- (Yeas 82 - Nays 64 - Absent 5 - Excused 0)
- ROLL CALL NO. 175
- On motion of Representative TUCKER of Brunswick, the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report was ACCEPTED.
- Reports READ.
On June 7, 2021 in the joint:
- Reported Out - ONTP/OTP-AM
On May 21, 2021 in the joint:
- Voted - Divided Report
- Work Session Held
On May 5, 2021 in the joint:
- Work Session Held - TABLED
On March 30, 2021 in the House:
- Carried over, in the same posture, to a subsequent special or regular session of the 130th Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order SP 435.
On March 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on ENVIRONMENT AND NATURAL RESOURCES in concurrence
On March 10, 2021 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on ENVIRONMENT AND NATURAL RESOURCES.
- Committee on Environment and Natural Resources suggested and ordered printed.
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (2)
June 9, 2021: ACCEPT MAJ ONTP RPT
- Yeas: 18
- Nays: 13
- Present/NV: 4
June 8, 2021: ACC MAJ OUGHT NOT TO PASS REP
- Yeas: 82
- Nays: 64
- Absent: 5
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor