+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (21)
On June 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- Became Law without Governor's Signature
On June 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
On June 15, 2017 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- PASSED TO BE ENACTED.
On June 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- Ordered sent down forthwith.
- Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-481), in concurrence.
- Committee Amendment "A" (H-481) READ and ADOPTED, in concurrence.
- READ ONCE.
- Report READ and ACCEPTED, in concurrence.
On June 12, 2017 in the House:
- CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY
- The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-481).
- Under suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY.
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
On March 14, 2017 in the Senate:
- The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on LABOR, COMMERCE, RESEARCH AND ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT in concurrence
On March 9, 2017 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- Subsequently, the Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on LABOR, COMMERCE, RESEARCH AND ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT.
- Speaker laid before the House
On March 7, 2017 in the House:
- Unfinished Business
- Later today assigned.
- On motion of Representative FECTEAU of Biddeford, TABLED pending REFERENCE.
- Committee on LABOR, COMMERCE, RESEARCH AND ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT suggested and ordered printed.
+ − Amendment
+ − Statute Amended
- Chapter 267 - 32 section 13759
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor