+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (28)
On June 30, 2015 in the House:
- Placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD)
- 89 having voted in the affirmative and 54 in the negative, with 8 being absent, and accordingly it was the vote of the House that the Bill not become a law and the veto was sustained.
- ROLL CALL NO. 402V
- This Bill, having been returned by the Governor, together with objections to the same pursuant to Article IV, Part Third, Section 2 of the Constitution of the State of Maine, after reconsideration, the House proceeded to vote on the question: "Shall this Bill become a law notwithstanding the objections of the Governor?"
On June 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Vetoed by the Governor
On June 15, 2015 in the Senate:
- PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
On June 15, 2015 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- PASSED TO BE ENACTED.
On June 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (H-299) , in concurrence.
- Committee Amendment "A" (H-299) READ and ADOPTED , in concurrence.
- READ ONCE
- On motion by Senator WHITTEMORE of Somerset The Majority Ought to Pass As Amended Report ACCEPTED , in concurrence.
- Taken from the table by the President ProTem
On June 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Unfinished Business
On June 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Unfinished Business
On June 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- Unfinished Business
On June 8, 2015 in the Senate:
- Reports READ On motion by Senator WHITTEMORE of Somerset Tabled until Later in Today's Session, pending ACCEPTANCE OF EITHER REPORT
On June 5, 2015 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-299).
- Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading.
- Committee Amendment "A" (H-299) was READ and ADOPTED.
- The Bill was READ ONCE.
- On motion of Representative MARTIN of Sinclair, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED.
- Reports READ.
On March 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- On motion by Senator Willette of Aroostook, REFERRED to the Committee on State and Local Government, in concurrence.
On March 12, 2015 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on STATE AND LOCAL GOVERNMENT.
- Committee on State and Local Government suggested and ordered printed.
+ − Amendment
+ − Vote
June 30, 2015: Reconsideration - Veto
- Yeas: 89
- Nays: 54
- Absent: 8
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor