+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (26)
On May 18, 2017 in the Senate:
- Veto Overridden
- LD 905 In Senate, May 18, 2017, this Bill, having been returned by the Governor, together with objections to the same pursuant to the provisions of the Constitution of the State of Maine, after reconsideration, the Senate proceeded to vote on the question: "Shall this Bill become a law notwithstanding the objections of the Governor?" 35 IN FAVOR and 0 AGAINST, accordingly it was the vote of the Senate that the Bill become law and the VETO was OVERRIDDEN.
On May 17, 2017 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- RELEASED.
- HELD at the Request of Representative McLEAN of Gorham.
- 125 having voted in the affirmative and 18 in the negative, with 6 being absent, and 2 excused, and accordingly it was the vote of the House that the Bill become a law notwithstanding the objections of the Governor, since two-thirds of the members of the House so voted.
- ROLL CALL NO. 108V
- This Bill, having been returned by the Governor, together with objections to the same pursuant to the provisions of the Constitution of the State of Maine, after reconsideration, the House proceeded to vote on the question: "Shall this Bill become a law notwithstanding the objections of the Governor?"
On May 4, 2017 in the Senate:
- PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
On May 2, 2017 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- PASSED TO BE ENACTED.
On April 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- COMMITTEE ON BILLS IN THE SECOND READING REPORTS NO FURTHER VERBAL AMENDMENTS NECESSARY, Senator Saviello, Senate Chair. REPORT ACCEPTED.
- READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-61), in concurrence.
- Ordered sent down forthwith.
On April 25, 2017 in the Senate:
- ASSIGNED FOR SECOND READING NEXT LEGISLATIVE DAY.
- Committee Amendment "A" (H-61) READ and ADOPTED, in concurrence.
- READ ONCE
- Report READ and ACCEPTED
On April 20, 2017 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-61).
- Under suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY.
- CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY
On March 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on TRANSPORTATION in concurrence
On March 7, 2017 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on TRANSPORTATION.
- Committee on Transportation suggested and ordered printed.
+ − Amendment
+ − Statutes Amended (5)
- Chapter 68 - 23 section 1964, sub-section 3-A
- Chapter 68 - 23 section 1965, sub-section 1, paragraph D-2
- Chapter 68 - 23 section 1965-C
- Chapter 68 - 23 section 1968, sub-section 2-D
- Chapter 68 - 23 section 1973, sub-section 3
+ − Votes (2)
May 18, 2017: Reconsideration - Veto
- Yeas: 35
May 17, 2017: Reconsideration - Veto
- Yeas: 125
- Nays: 18
- Present/NV: 2
- Absent: 6