+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (17)
On June 1, 2015 in the Senate:
- Placed in the Legislative Files (DEAD).
- On motion by Senator VOLK of Cumberland the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report ACCEPTED, in concurrence.
- Reports READ.
On May 29, 2015 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- (Yeas 118 - Nays 22 - Absent 11 - Excused 0)
- ROLL CALL NO. 114
- On motion of Representative HERBIG of Belfast, the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report was ACCEPTED.
- Reports READ.
On January 22, 2015 in the Senate:
- On motion by Senator VOLK of Cumberland REFERRED to the Committee on LABOR, COMMERCE, RESEARCH AND ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT , in concurrence.
- Taken from the table by the President
On January 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Unfinished Business
On January 14, 2015 in the Senate:
- (Unfinished Business)
On January 13, 2015 in the Senate:
- Unfinished Business
- On motion by Senator VOLK of Cumberland Tabled until Later in Today's Session, pending REFERENCE
On January 8, 2015 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on LABOR, COMMERCE, RESEARCH AND ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT.
- Committee on Labor, Commerce, Research and Economic Development suggested and ordered printed.
+ − Amendment
+ − Vote
May 29, 2015: ACC MAJ OUGHT NOT TO PASS REP
- Yeas: 118
- Nays: 22
- Absent: 11
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor