+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On June 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- Pursuant to Joint Rule 310.3 Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
On June 1, 2021 in the joint:
- Reported Out - ONTP
On May 27, 2021 in the joint:
- Voted - ONTP
- Work Session Held
On March 30, 2021 in the Senate:
- CARRIED OVER, in the same posture, to a subsequent special or regular session of the 130th Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order SP 435.
On March 18, 2021 in the joint:
- Work Session Held - TABLED
On March 4, 2021 in the joint:
- Work Session Held - TABLED
On January 11, 2021 in the Senate:
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate on January 11, 2021 and REFERRED to the Committee on ENERGY, UTILITIES AND TECHNOLOGY pursuant to Joint Rule 308.2
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor