+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (9)
On February 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Pursuant to Joint Rule 310.3 Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
On August 2, 2017 in the House:
- Carried over to any special or regular session, or both, of the 128th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 1138.
On August 2, 2017 in the Senate:
- CARRIED OVER to any Special or Regular Session of the 128th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 1138.
On March 14, 2017 in the Senate:
- On motion by Senator BRAKEY of Androscoggin The Senate RECEDED and CONCURRED With REFERENCE to the Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES in concurrence
On March 9, 2017 in the House:
- ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES In NON-CONCURRENCE and sent for concurrence.
On March 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence
- On motion by Senator VOLK of Cumberland The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on LABOR, COMMERCE, RESEARCH AND ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT
- Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES suggested and ordered printed