+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (33)
On June 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor
On June 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- Roll Call Ordered Roll Call # 149 35 Yeas - 0 Nays- 0 Excused - 0 Absent
- PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
On June 3, 2015 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- PASSED TO BE ENACTED.
On June 1, 2015 in the House:
- In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED.
- Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading.
- The Bill was READ ONCE.
- (Yeas 98 - Nays 43 - Absent 10 - Excused 0)
- ROLL CALL NO. 131
- Subsequently, on motion of Representative FOWLE of Vassalboro, the Majority Ought to Pass Report was ACCEPTED.
- Speaker laid before the House
On May 29, 2015 in the House:
- Unfinished Business
On May 28, 2015 in the House:
- Unfinished Business
On May 27, 2015 in the House:
- Unfinished Business
On May 26, 2015 in the House:
- Unfinished Business
On May 21, 2015 in the House:
- Unfinished Business
On May 20, 2015 in the House:
- Unfinished Business
- Later today assigned.
- On motion of Representative FOWLE of Vassalboro TABLED pending ACCEPTANCE of Either Report.
- Reports READ.
On May 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence.
- Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED
- READ ONCE
- On motion by Senator ROSEN of Hancock Majority Ought to Pass Report ACCEPTED
- Reports READ
On March 12, 2015 in the House:
- In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- Bill REFERRED to the Committee on CRIMINAL JUSTICE AND PUBLIC SAFETY.
On March 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence.
- On motion by Senator Rosen of Hancock REFERRED to the Committee on CRIMINAL JUSTICE AND PUBLIC SAFETY
- suggested and ordered printed
- Committee on CRIMINAL JUSTICE AND PUBLIC SAFETY
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
- Chapter 144 - 25 section 2001-A, sub-section 2, paragraph F
- Chapter 144 - 25 section 2003, sub-section 11
+ − Votes (2)
June 4, 2015: ENACTMENT
- Yeas: 35
June 1, 2015: ACC MAJ OUGHT TO PASS REP
- Yeas: 98
- Nays: 43
- Absent: 10
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor