+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (49)
On June 10, 2013 in the Senate:
- FINALLY PASSED - Emergency - 2/3 Elected Required, in concurrence.
On June 10, 2013 in the House:
- FINALLY PASSED.
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
On June 6, 2013 in the House:
- The Resolve was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED.
- Speaker laid before the House
- The Resolve was READ ONCE.
- Under suspension of the rules, the Resolve was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading.
- Subsequently, the Majority Ought to Pass Report was ACCEPTED.
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
On June 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reports READ.
- On motion by Senator VALENTINO of York the Majority Ought to Pass Report ACCEPTED, in concurrence.
- READ ONCE.
- Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED, in concurrence.
On June 5, 2013 in the House:
- Unfinished Business
On June 4, 2013 in the House:
- Unfinished Business
On June 3, 2013 in the House:
- Unfinished Business
- Later today assigned.
- On further motion of the same Representative TABLED pending his motion to ACCEPT the Majority Ought to Pass Report.
- Representative PRIEST of Brunswick moved to ACCEPT the Majority Ought to Pass Report.
- Reports READ.
On April 10, 2013 in the Senate:
- On motion by Senator JACKSON of Aroostook, the Senate RECEDED and CONCURRED to REFERENCE to the Committee on Judiciary.
- On motion by Senator JACKSON of Aroostook, the Senate RECEDED and CONCURRED to REFERENCE to the Committee on Judiciary.
On April 9, 2013 in the House:
- Speaker laid before the House
- The House INSISTED to REFERENCE to the Committee on JUDICIARY.
- ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
On April 4, 2013 in the House:
- Unfinished Business
On April 3, 2013 in the House:
- Unfinished Business
On April 2, 2013 in the House:
- Unfinished Business
On March 28, 2013 in the House:
- Unfinished Business
On March 27, 2013 in the House:
- Unfinished Business
On March 26, 2013 in the House:
- Unfinished Business
- Later today assigned.
- On motion of Representative WELSH of Rockport, TABLED pending FURTHER CONSIDERATION.
On March 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence.
- On motion by Senator JACKSON of Aroostook REFERRED to the Committee on ENVIRONMENT AND NATURAL RESOURCES, in NON-CONCURRENCE.
- TAKEN from the Table by the President.
On March 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- (Unfinished Business)
On March 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- (Unfinished Business)
On March 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- (Unfinished Business)
- On motion by Senator JACKSON of Aroostook TABLED until Later in Today's Session, pending REFERENCE, in concurrence.
- Report READ and ACCEPTED.
On March 7, 2013 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- On motion of Representative WELSH of Rockport, the Resolve was REFERRED to the Committee on JUDICIARY.
- Speaker laid before the House
On March 5, 2013 in the House:
- Unfinished Business
- Later today assigned.
- On motion of Representative WELSH of Rockport, TABLED pending REFERENCE.
- Report was READ and ACCEPTED.
- Representative WELSH for the Department of Environmental Protection pursuant to the Maine Revised Statutes, Title 5, section 8072, Reports that the Resolve be REFERRED to the Committee on ENVIRONMENT AND NATURAL RESOURCES and printed pursuant to Joint Rule 218.
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor