+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (30)
On July 9, 2018 in the Senate:
- Veto Overridden
- LD 843 In Senate, July 9, 2018, this Bill, having been returned by the Governor, together with objections to the same pursuant to the provisions of the Constitution of the State of Maine, after reconsideration, the Senate proceeded to vote on the question: "Shall this Bill become a law notwithstanding the objections of the Governor?" 30 IN FAVOR and 2 AGAINST, accordingly it was the vote of the Senate that the Bill become law and the VETO was OVERRIDDEN.
On July 9, 2018 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- 131 having voted in the affirmative and 12 in the negative, with 8 being absent, and accordingly it was the vote of the House that the Bill become a law notwithstanding the objections of the Governor, since two-thirds of the members of the House so voted.
- ROLL CALL NO. 700V
- This Bill, having been returned by the Governor, together with objections to the same pursuant to Article IV, Part Third, Section 2 of the Constitution of the State of Maine, after reconsideration, the House proceeded to vote on the question: "Shall this Bill become a law notwithstanding the objections of the Governor?"
On July 9, 2018 in the Senate:
- in concurrence
On June 20, 2018 in the Senate:
- PASSED TO BE ENACTED in concurrence
- On Motion by Senator KATZ of Kennebec taken from the SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE.
On May 2, 2018 in the Senate:
- CARRIED OVER to any Special Session of the 128th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order SP 748.
On August 2, 2017 in the Senate:
- CARRIED OVER to any Special or Regular Session of the 128th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order SP 601.
On May 31, 2017 in the Senate:
- On motion by Senator KATZ of Kennebec PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE pending ENACTMENT
On May 30, 2017 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- PASSED TO BE ENACTED.
On May 25, 2017 in the Senate:
- On motion by Senator CYRWAY of Kennebec the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report ACCEPTED. in concurrence
- Reports Read
- Committee Amendment "A" (H-217) READ and ADOPTED
- READ ONCE
- Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME AND PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-217) in concurrence
On May 24, 2017 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-217).
- Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading.
- Committee Amendment "A" (H-217) was READ and ADOPTED.
- The Bill was READ ONCE.
- On motion of Representative DUCHESNE of Hudson, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED.
- Reports READ.
On March 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on INLAND FISHERIES AND WILDLIFE in concurrence
On March 7, 2017 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on INLAND FISHERIES AND WILDLIFE.
- Committee on Inland Fisheries and Wildlife suggested and ordered printed.
+ − Amendment
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
- Chapter 458 - 12 section 11154, sub-section 14
- Chapter 458 - 12 section 11154, sub-section 2
+ − Votes (2)
July 9, 2018: Reconsideration - Veto
- Yeas: 131
- Nays: 12
- Absent: 8
July 9, 2018: Reconsideration - Veto
- Yeas: 30
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 2
- Absent: 1