+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (18)
On April 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
On April 23, 2013 in the House:
- PASSED TO BE ENACTED.
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
On April 9, 2013 in the Senate:
- Ordered sent down forthwith.
- READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED, in concurrence.
- COMMITTEE ON BILLS IN THE SECOND READING REPORTS NO FURTHER VERBAL AMENDMENTS NECESSARY, Senator Cleveland, Senate Chair. REPORT ACCEPTED.
On April 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- ASSIGNED FOR SECOND READING NEXT LEGISLATIVE DAY.
- READ ONCE.
- Report READ and ACCEPTED, in concurrence.
On April 3, 2013 in the House:
- Committee on Bills in the Second Reading Reports no further verbal amendments necessary Representative McLEAN of Gorham, Chair, House of Representatives Report Accepted.
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY.
- The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED.
On April 2, 2013 in the House:
- CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY
On March 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- On motion by Senator Jackson of Aroostook, REFERRED to the Committee on CRIMINAL JUSTICE AND PUBLIC SAFETY and ordered printed, in concurrence.
On March 5, 2013 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on CRIMINAL JUSTICE AND PUBLIC SAFETY.
- Committee on Criminal Justice and Public Safety suggested and ordered printed.
+ − Statutes Amended (9)
- Chapter 56 - 8 section 221-A, sub-section 5-A
- Chapter 56 - 8 section 221-A, sub-section 5-B
- Chapter 56 - 8 section 221-A, sub-section 8-A
- Chapter 56 - 8 section 227-C, sub-section 4
- Chapter 56 - 8 section 231
- Chapter 56 - 8 section 232, sub-section 2
- Chapter 56 - 8 section 232, sub-section 3
- Chapter 56 - 8 section 233, paragraph 1
- Chapter 56 - 8 section 233, sub-section 2