+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (17)
On March 31, 2015 in the Senate:
- Pursuant to Joint Rule 310.3 Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
On March 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- On motion by Senator CYRWAY of Kennebec The Senate RECEDED and CONCURRED With REFERENCE to Committee on Veterans and Legal Affairs , in concurrence.
On March 19, 2015 in the House:
- ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- Subsequently, the House INSISTED on REFERENCE to the Committee on VETERANS AND LEGAL AFFAIRS.
- Speaker laid before the House
On March 18, 2015 in the House:
- Unfinished Business
- Later today assigned.
- On motion of Representative McCABE of Skowhegan, TABLED pending FURTHER CONSIDERATION.
On March 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Taken from the table by the President
- Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence.
- On motion by Senator Davis of Piscataquis REFERRED to the Committee on INLAND FISHERIES AND WILDLIFE , in NON-CONCURRENCE.
On March 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- Unfinished Business
On March 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Unfinished Business
- On motion by Senator CYRWAY of Kennebec Tabled until Later in Today's Session, pending REFERENCE
On March 10, 2015 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- The RESOLUTION was REFERRED to the Committee on VETERANS AND LEGAL AFFAIRS.
- Committee on Veterans and Legal Affairs suggested and ordered printed.